IN SB0492 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes expired provisions concerning rate transition periods for telecommunications service providers. Provides that a tariff filed by a telecommunications service provider as required by the utility regulatory commission (IURC) serves as public notice of the filing of the tariff . Repeals statutes concerning: (1) rate reduction programs; and (2) certain settlement agreements. Deletes certain reporting requirements of communications service providers to the IURC. Limits information requested by the IURC for certain purposes from a communications service provider to public information provided to the Federal Communications Commission. Repeals a chapter concerning telephone caller identification services. Provides that a communications service provider is not eligible for property tax exemptions for the facilities or technologies used in providing broadband service if the facilities or technologies are used in a location where wireline broadband service is provided. Repeals the Indiana lifeline assistance program. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Various telecommunications matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 256 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 490: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 352: yeas 92, nays 3 |
2013-03-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Hale |
2013-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Koch |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |