IN SB0546 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortion matters. Amends the definition of "abortion clinic" as follows: (1) Refers to a health care provider instead of a freestanding entity. (2) Exempts from the definition of "abortion clinic" a health care provider that provides an abortion inducing drug for the purposes of inducing an abortion to fewer than five patients a year. (Current law exempts certain physician's offices.) Requires that a person seeking a waiver by the health commissioner from rules authorized by the hospital council must affirmatively demonstrate that the waiver will not adversely affect or increase any risk to the health, safety, or welfare of an
Title
Abortion matters. Amends the definition of "abortion clinic" as follows: (1) Refers to a health care provider instead of a freestanding entity. (2) Exempts from the definition of "abortion clinic" a health care provider that provides an abortion inducing drug for the purposes of inducing an abortion to fewer than five patients a year. (Current law exempts certain physician's offices.) Requires that a person seeking a waiver by the health commissioner from rules authorized by the hospital council must affirmatively demonstrate that the waiver will not adversely affect or increase any risk to the health, safety, or welfare of an
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Provider Services - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Public Law 92 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-24 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2015-03-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 328: yeas 77, nays 22 |
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Representative Frye added as cosponsor |
2015-03-12 | House | Representative Wesco added as cosponsor |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Negele added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 41, nays 8 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Young, M. added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senators Messmer and Holdman |