IN SCR0006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Trooper Peter "Bo" Stephan and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name a portion of State Road 25 the "Trooper Peter "Bo" Stephan Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Trooper Peter "Bo" Stephan and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name a portion of State Road 25 the "Trooper Peter "Bo" Stephan Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseReturned to the Senate
2020-02-27HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 222: yeas 90, nays 0
2020-01-29HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-27HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2020-01-22SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-21SenateSenators Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Grooms, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Spartz, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zay added as coauthors
2020-01-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehe
2020-01-21SenateSecond reading: adopted standing vote
2020-01-16SenateSenator Buck added as third author
2020-01-16SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2020-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Buchanan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/senate/concurrent/6
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/e/f/26efe697/SC0006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/0/9/3209696b/SC0006.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/5/8/de58f867/SC0006.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/3/6/3e36c35d/SC0006.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/5/3/ef53fff1/SC0006.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/7/b/b47b12f3/SC0006.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/b/0/5eb037d8/SC0006.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/b/2/d1b207d8/SC0006.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/1/e/2b1ee074/SC0006.03.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/b/d/d6bdffb3/SC0006.222_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback