IN SCR0007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 84-26)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Representatives Bosma, Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Baird, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Boy, Brown, T., Burton, Campbell, Cherry, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Davisson, Deal, DeLaney, DeVon, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Hamilton, Harris, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Jordan, Karickhoff, Lauer, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Negele, Prescott, Schaibley, Sherman D, Smaltz, Soliday, Speedy, Stutzman, Thompson, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 84-26)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Representatives Bosma, Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Baird, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Boy, Brown, T., Burton, Campbell, Cherry, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Davisson, Deal, DeLaney, DeVon, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Hamilton, Harris, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Jordan, Karickhoff, Lauer, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Negele, Prescott, Schaibley, Sherman D, Smaltz, Soliday, Speedy, Stutzman, Thompson, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana University in recognition of its Bicentennial Anniversary on January 20, 2020.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana University in recognition of its Bicentennial Anniversary on January 20, 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Representatives Bosma, Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Baird, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Boy, Brown, T., Burton, Campbell, Cherry, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Davisson, Deal, DeLaney, DeVon, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Hamilton, Harris, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Jordan, Karickhoff, Lauer, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Negele, Prescott, Schaibley, Sherman D, Smaltz, Soliday, Speedy, Stutzman, Thompson, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors |
2020-01-21 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Grooms, Holdman, Houchin, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Spartz, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2020-01-16 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pierce |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Authored by Senators Koch and Stoops |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/senate/concurrent/7/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/e/c/31ece950/SC0007.01.INTR.pdf |