IN SR0004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION concerning the motor vehicle inspection and maintenance programs in Lake and Porter counties.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION concerning the motor vehicle inspection and maintenance programs in Lake and Porter counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senators Niemeyer and Doriot |