KS H2559 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
School districts; expenditures over $20,000. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
School districts; expenditures over $20,000. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2010-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Education Budget -HJ 1181 | |
2010-01-29 | Hearing: Thurs., 2/4/2010, 3:30PM, Rm 159-S | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Education Budget -HJ 842 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced -HJ 840 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |