KS HB2003 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities; annexation of non-adjoining land.
Title
Cities; annexation of non-adjoining land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 106 Nay: 7 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 11 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Part 1 by Senator LaTurner was adopted. - Yea: 20 Nay: 16 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 2 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 11 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Part 1 by Senator LaTurner was adopted. - Yea: 20 Nay: 16 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 2 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-27 | House | House Reengrossed on Wednesday, May 27 , 2015 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 106 Nay: 7 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 1 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Pyle, Senator LaTurner and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees |
2015-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Huebert , Representative Phillips and Representative Alcala as conferees |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 11 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Senator La Turner withdrew his motion to divide the question. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Part 1 by Senator LaTurner was adopted. Yea: 20 Nay: 16 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to divide the question - offered by Senator LaTurner. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 17, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-05 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 2 |
2015-02-05 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 04 , 2015 |
2015-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Claeys was adopted |
2015-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Claeys |
2015-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 20, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 281N |
2015-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-01-12 | House | House Introduced |
2015-01-12 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 16, 2014 |