KS HB2105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2105 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development- Employment security law.
Title
Substitute for HB 2105 by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development- Employment security law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 89 Nay: 31 (Y: 89 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 88 Nay: 35 (Y: 88 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 88 Nay: 35 (Y: 88 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 89 Nay: 31 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-04-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Frownfelter appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Wagle and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Wagle and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2013-03-27 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kleeb , Representative Suellentrop and Representative Frownfelter as conferees |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 10 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 88 Nay: 35 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 05, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2013-01-28 | House | House Introduced |