KS HB2154 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the statewide election of commissioners of the state corporation commission, establishing the utilities regulation division in the office of the attorney general, requiring such division to represent and protect the collective interests of utility customers in utility rate-related proceedings and exempting the state corporation commission from the open meetings act.
Title
Providing for the statewide election of commissioners of the state corporation commission, establishing the utilities regulation division in the office of the attorney general, requiring such division to represent and protect the collective interests of utility customers in utility rate-related proceedings and exempting the state corporation commission from the open meetings act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2023-02-17 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:01 AM Room 582-N |
2023-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2023-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2023-01-24 | House | House Introduced |