KS HB2158 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2158 by Committee on Ways and Means -- School districts; use of funds from tax levies on motor vehicles and recreational vehicles.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2158 by Committee on Ways and Means -- School districts; use of funds from tax levies on motor vehicles and recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 2 (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-28 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-05-12 | Engrossed on Wednesday, 23 February 2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 2 | |
2011-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-18 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced |