KS HB2159 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for additional sources of revenue for the water program management fund and creating additional fees for the regulation of underground injection control wells.
Title
Providing for additional sources of revenue for the water program management fund and creating additional fees for the regulation of underground injection control wells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2023-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-24 | House | House Introduced |