KS HB2189 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2189 by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care - Granting jurisdiction to the court to extend custody of non-minor dependents and allow the secretary for children and families to provide reentry services to an eligible young adult.
Title
Substitute for HB 2189 by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care - Granting jurisdiction to the court to extend custody of non-minor dependents and allow the secretary for children and families to provide reentry services to an eligible young adult.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2023-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2023-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2023-01-26 | House | House Introduced |