KS HB2204 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 22 May 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 22 May 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to redemption of real property.
Title
Relating to redemption of real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 22 May 2013 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 17, 2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | House Reengrossed on Tuesday, 14 May 2013 |
2013-05-13 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2013-05-13 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 3(f) - 30 Minute Rule adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2013-03-25 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Bruchman and Representative Pauls as conferees |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, 28 February 2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2013-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | House | House Introduced |