KS HB2278 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a penalty enhancement for the theft or burglary of a firearm.
Title
Creating a penalty enhancement for the theft or burglary of a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 4 (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 05, 2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2013, 10:30 AM Room 212-N |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-06 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 4 |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2013-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 152-S--CANCELLED |
2013-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2013-02-08 | House | House Introduced |