KS HB2295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting municipal motor grader vehicle operators from Kansas uniform commercial drivers' license act requirements.
Title
Exempting municipal motor grader vehicle operators from Kansas uniform commercial drivers' license act requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 6, 2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-04 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-09 | House | House Introduced |