KS HB2324 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district finance and quality performance act of 2017.
Title
School district finance and quality performance act of 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2017-02-14 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2017-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2324/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2324_00_0000.pdf |