KS HB2364 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2364 by Committee on Appropriations - Appropriations for FY 2017, FY 2018, FY 2019 and FY 2020 for various state agencies.
Title
Substitute for HB 2364 by Committee on Appropriations - Appropriations for FY 2017, FY 2018, FY 2019 and FY 2020 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | House Introduced |