KS HB2377 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a property tax averaging payment plan and a property tax installment payment plan.
Title
Providing for a property tax averaging payment plan and a property tax installment payment plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 04, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2016-01-20 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 28, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 582-N-CANCELLED |
2015-02-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-02-19 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2377/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2377_00_0000.pdf |