KS HB2385 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an inference of an intent to distribute a controlled substance based on the quantity of the substance possessed instead of a rebuttable presumption.
Title
Creating an inference of an intent to distribute a controlled substance based on the quantity of the substance possessed instead of a rebuttable presumption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2023-02-09 | House | House Introduced |