KS HB2390 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Making permanent certain exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act, creating exemptions in the open records act for cyber security assessments, plans and vulnerabilities, prohibiting the filing of certain liens or claims against real or personal property and providing for criminal penalties and authorizing local correctional or detention officers and administrative hearing officers to have identifying information restricted from public access on public websites that identify home addresses or home ownership.
Title
Making permanent certain exceptions to the disclosure of public records under the open records act, creating exemptions in the open records act for cyber security assessments, plans and vulnerabilities, prohibiting the filing of certain liens or claims against real or personal property and providing for criminal penalties and authorizing local correctional or detention officers and administrative hearing officers to have identifying information restricted from public access on public websites that identify home addresses or home ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Engrossed on Sunday, April 11, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 2 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Bowers, Senator McGinn and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2021-04-06 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transparency and Ethics |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transparency and Ethics |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |