KS HB2391 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning driving under the influence and other driving offenses; use of ignition interlock devices; expungement of convictions and diversions.
Title
Concerning driving under the influence and other driving offenses; use of ignition interlock devices; expungement of convictions and diversions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-03-30 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | House Introduced |