KS HB2398 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2398 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Roads and highways; traffic-control devices maintained by counties and townships.
Title
Substitute for HB 2398 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Roads and highways; traffic-control devices maintained by counties and townships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Monday, April 02, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 144-S |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-28 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-04-03 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 30, 2017, 08:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-29 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2017, 08:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-27 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 27, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2017-03-16 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | House Introduced |