KS HB2422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 04 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, 04 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defining watercraft for purposes of taxation.
Title
Defining watercraft for purposes of taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, 04 April 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 01, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 13, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-02-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-02-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-01-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N-CANCELLED |
2014-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-01-13 | House | House Introduced |
2014-01-13 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, January 06, 2014 |