KS HB2485 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring enrollment under the Kansas school equity and enhancement act to be determined using the current school year or the preceding school year and requiring any district that closed a school building in the preceding school year to use the current year enrollment count.
Title
Requiring enrollment under the Kansas school equity and enhancement act to be determined using the current school year or the preceding school year and requiring any district that closed a school building in the preceding school year to use the current year enrollment count.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 22, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-01-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-01-08 | House | House Introduced |
2024-01-08 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 5, 2024 |