KS HB2489 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the legislative option to purchase school district buildings to buildings that were formerly used as attendance centers.
Title
Limiting the legislative option to purchase school district buildings to buildings that were formerly used as attendance centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-01-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-01-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-08 | House | House Introduced |