KS HB2528 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - House Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - House Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting residential homestead property taxes to not more than the established base year amount for individuals 65 years of age and older.
Title
Restricting residential homestead property taxes to not more than the established base year amount for individuals 65 years of age and older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2024-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-01-18 | House | House Introduced |