KS HB2542 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax exemption for amateur-built aircraft; local ad valorem property tax relief fund, distribution of revenues.
Title
Property tax exemption for amateur-built aircraft; local ad valorem property tax relief fund, distribution of revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 4 (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Menghini was adopted - Yea: 102 Nay: 17 (Y: 102 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Menghini was adopted - Yea: 102 Nay: 17 (Y: 102 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2014-03-13 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 4 |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Menghini was adopted Yea: 102 Nay: 17 |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Menghini |
2014-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2014-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-01-30 | House | House Introduced |