KS HB2580 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating consumer reporting agencies' authority to charge certain fees related to consumer report security freezes.
Title
Eliminating consumer reporting agencies' authority to charge certain fees related to consumer report security freezes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 02, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2018-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |