KS HB2627 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organizing requirements for public assistance program sections within the statute.
Title
Organizing requirements for public assistance program sections within the statute.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Welfare Reform |
2024-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2024-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Welfare Reform |
2024-01-30 | House | House Introduced |