KS HB2629 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary for health and environment to provide a death certificate of a child to the state child death review board, increasing the number of board members, allowing for compensation and providing for the disclosure of certain records to certain persons for securing grants.
Title
Requiring the secretary for health and environment to provide a death certificate of a child to the state child death review board, increasing the number of board members, allowing for compensation and providing for the disclosure of certain records to certain persons for securing grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024 |
2024-04-01 | House | House Reengrossed on Friday, March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 1 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2024-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care |
2024-01-30 | House | House Introduced |