KS HB2655 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary of corrections to establish procedures to provide inmates with an opportunity to take a nationally recognized career readiness assessment.
Title
Requiring the secretary of corrections to establish procedures to provide inmates with an opportunity to take a nationally recognized career readiness assessment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2022-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-09 | House | House Introduced |