KS HB2679 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the director of vehicles to waive the knowledge and skills test for driving a commercial vehicle for an applicant that provides evidence that such applicant qualifies for the military even exchange program for commercial driver's licenses.
Title
Authorizing the director of vehicles to waive the knowledge and skills test for driving a commercial vehicle for an applicant that provides evidence that such applicant qualifies for the military even exchange program for commercial driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-05 | House | House Introduced |