KS HB2695 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing special agents from the department of corrections to attend the Kansas law enforcement training center.
Title
Allowing special agents from the department of corrections to attend the Kansas law enforcement training center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2020-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | House Introduced |