KS HB2717 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the determination of virtual school state aid for adult students.
Title
Establishing requirements for the determination of virtual school state aid for adult students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-06 | House | House Introduced |