KS HB2737 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the abolish abortion Kansas act to make all abortions subject to criminal prosecution for violation of Alexa's law and to remove the exceptions to the wrongful cause of death action for lawful abortions.
Title
Creating the abolish abortion Kansas act to make all abortions subject to criminal prosecution for violation of Alexa's law and to remove the exceptions to the wrongful cause of death action for lawful abortions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-03-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-03-08 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-07 | House | House Introduced |