KS HB2738 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the special education state aid statewide excess costs calculation to count additional funding, requiring the state board of education to determine each school district's excess costs and to establish a special education state aid equalization distribution schedule to distribute certain amounts of special education state aid and requiring school districts to transfer amounts attributable to the special education weighting from their supplemental general funds to their special education funds.
Title
Revising the special education state aid statewide excess costs calculation to count additional funding, requiring the state board of education to determine each school district's excess costs and to establish a special education state aid equalization distribution schedule to distribute certain amounts of special education state aid and requiring school districts to transfer amounts attributable to the special education weighting from their supplemental general funds to their special education funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2024-02-07 | House | House Introduced |