KS HB2754 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties to use home rule powers to exempt from conducting school sanitary inspections.
Title
Authorizing counties to use home rule powers to exempt from conducting school sanitary inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 5 (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 5 (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 114 Nay: 5 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | House | House Introduced |