KS HCR5008 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 74 Nay: 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 74 Nay: 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call for a convention of the states for the limited purpose of amending the constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government.
Title
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call for a convention of the states for the limited purpose of amending the constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority - Yea: 74 Nay: 48 (Y: 74 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 73 Nay: 46 (Y: 73 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 73 Nay: 46 (Y: 73 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 74 Nay: 48 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended Yea: 73 Nay: 46 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-07 | House | House Introduced |