KS HCR5023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, March 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, March 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the adjournment of the Senate and House of Representatives for a period of time during the 2020 regular session of the Legislature.
Title
Providing for the adjournment of the Senate and House of Representatives for a period of time during the 2020 regular session of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] | Rep. Dan Hawkins [R] | Rep. Tom Sawyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted without roll call |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2020-02-26 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hcr5023/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hcr5023_enrolled.pdf |