KS HR6029 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - House Enrolled on Thursday, February 6, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - House Enrolled on Thursday, February 6, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating January 30, 2020, as Latina Leaders Day at the Capitol.
Title
Designating January 30, 2020, as Latina Leaders Day at the Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, February 6, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2020-01-29 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hr6029/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hr6029_enrolled.pdf |