KS S0249 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Pharmacists; dispensing substitution of drug product. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Pharmacists; dispensing substitution of drug product. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Health and Human Services -HJ 205 | |
2009-02-19 | Received and introduced -HJ 203 | |
2009-02-20 | Engrossed -SJ 238 | |
2009-02-19 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 221 | |
2009-02-18 | COW: Be am.; be passed as am. -SJ 214 | |
2009-02-12 | CR: Be passed by Public Health and Welfare -SJ 167 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 139 | |
2009-02-09 | Introduced -SJ 127 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |