KS SB122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain rules of evidence in the code of civil procedure related to authentication of records and documents.
Title
Modifying certain rules of evidence in the code of civil procedure related to authentication of records and documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 8 (Y: 115 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 7 (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 8 (Y: 115 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 7 (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 115 Nay: 8 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-06 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley as conferees |
2021-03-30 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 7 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-03-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Introduced |