KS SB133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, February 23 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, February 23 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Possession or consumption of alcoholic beverage by minor; immunity from criminal prosecution for minor seeking medical assistance.
Title
Possession or consumption of alcoholic beverage by minor; immunity from criminal prosecution for minor seeking medical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 27 (Y: 92 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 92 Nay: 27 (Y: 92 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 5 (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, February 23 , 2016 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, February 15, 2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2016-02-05 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 92 Nay: 27 |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2015-03-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-30 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 5 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |