KS SB160 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 160 by Committee on Judiciary -- Relating to collection of child support payments.
Title
House Substitute for SB 160 by Committee on Judiciary -- Relating to collection of child support payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Monday, 21 May 2012 | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 15, 2012 | |
2012-05-11 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-11 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-10 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-05-10 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-26 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Owens , Senator King and Senator Haley as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 4 | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-24 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced |