KS SB187 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the workers compensation and employment security boards nominating committee; administrative law judges; appeals board; duties of secretary of health and environment; filing claims; AMA guide; workplace health and safety program.
Title
Establishing the workers compensation and employment security boards nominating committee; administrative law judges; appeals board; duties of secretary of health and environment; filing claims; AMA guide; workplace health and safety program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 29 Nay: 10 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 89 Nay: 31 (Y: 89 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 34 (Y: 88 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 9 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 30 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 89 Nay: 31 (Y: 89 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 34 (Y: 88 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 9 (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 30 (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 29 Nay: 10 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 89 Nay: 31 |
2013-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Lynn, Senator Wagle and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Frownfelter appointed as second conferees |
2013-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Frownfelter appointed as conferees |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Lynn , Senator Wagle and Senator Holland as conferees |
2013-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 34 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burroughs was rejected |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Burroughs |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-15 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2013-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 346-S -CANCELLED |
2013-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2013-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 9 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Apple was adopted |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Apple |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S CANCELLED |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |