KS SB249 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 249 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Providing for the filling of a vacancy in the office of state treasurer, commissioner of insurance or lieutenant governor by appointment of a person of the same political party as the incumbent office holder and making such appointment subject to senate confirmation.
Title
Substitute for SB 249 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Providing for the filling of a vacancy in the office of state treasurer, commissioner of insurance or lieutenant governor by appointment of a person of the same political party as the incumbent office holder and making such appointment subject to senate confirmation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 18, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |