KS SB257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a presumption of child's equal time with parents during court determinations of legal custody, residency or parenting time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a presumption of child's equal time with parents during court determinations of legal custody, residency or parenting time.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died in Committee
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2018-01-08SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-08SenateSenate Introduced
2018-01-08SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 14, 2017

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback