KS SB30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating definitions relating to small employer health plans and association health plans.
Title
Updating definitions relating to small employer health plans and association health plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb30/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb30_00_0000.pdf |