KS SB31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain association health plans from requirements pertaining to small employer health plans.
Title
Exempting certain association health plans from requirements pertaining to small employer health plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb31/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb31_00_0000.pdf |