KS SB335 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing penalties and creating a crime for injuring or causing death of certain authorized emergency vehicle operators for unlawful passing of stationary authorized emergency vehicle.
Title
Increasing penalties and creating a crime for injuring or causing death of certain authorized emergency vehicle operators for unlawful passing of stationary authorized emergency vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |